GA HB597 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 18 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-03-21 - Senate Read and Referred
Pending: Senate State and Local Governmental Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

A BILL to be entitled an Act to provide a new charter for the City of Sparks, Georgia; to provide for other matters relative to the foregoing; to provide for related matters; to repeal a specific law; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Sparks, City of; provide new charter

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-18 - House - House Vote #241 (Y: 157 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 9) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-21SenateSenate Read and Referred
2019-03-18HouseHouse Passed/Adopted
2019-03-18HouseHouse Third Readers
2019-03-18HouseHouse Committee Favorably Reported
2019-03-14HouseHouse Second Readers
2019-03-13HouseHouse First Readers
2019-03-11HouseHouse Hopper

Georgia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback