GA HB597 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 3 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-03 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 3 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-03 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend an Act reincorporating and providing a new charter for the City of Trenton in Dade County, approved March 26, 1987 (Ga. L. 1987, p. 4725), as amended, so as to change the position of city clerk from elective to appointive; to provide for the current city clerk to serve out the remainder of his or her term; to provide for the appointment of city clerks; to provide for the election of certain city officers; to provide for related matters; to provide for an effective date; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Trenton, City of; Dade County; change position of city clerk from elective to appointive; provisions
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-03-28 - Senate - Senate Vote #248 (Y: 49 N: 2 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-24 - House - House Vote #300 (Y: 155 N: 0 NV: 17 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2017-03-24 - House - House Vote #300 (Y: 155 N: 0 NV: 17 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-03 | Effective Date | |
2017-05-03 | Act 106 | |
2017-05-03 | House | House Date Signed by Governor |
2017-04-04 | House | House Sent to Governor |
2017-03-28 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted |
2017-03-28 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2017-03-24 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2017-03-24 | House | House Passed/Adopted |
2017-03-24 | House | House Third Readers |
2017-03-24 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported |
2017-03-22 | House | House Second Readers |
2017-03-20 | House | House First Readers |
2017-03-16 | House | House Hopper |