GA HB596 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on May 4 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-04 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

A BILL to be entitled an Act to authorize the governing authority of the City of Tucker to levy an excise tax pursuant to subsection (b) of Code Section 48-13-51 of the O.C.G.A.; to provide procedures, conditions, and limitations; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Tucker, City of; levy an excise tax

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-03-28 - Senate - Senate Vote #248 (Y: 49 N: 2 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-22 - House - House Vote #291 (Y: 160 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 7) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-04 Effective Date
2017-05-04 Act 156
2017-05-04HouseHouse Date Signed by Governor
2017-04-04HouseHouse Sent to Governor
2017-03-28SenateSenate Passed/Adopted
2017-03-28SenateSenate Committee Favorably Reported
2017-03-24SenateSenate Read and Referred
2017-03-22HouseHouse Passed/Adopted
2017-03-22HouseHouse Third Readers
2017-03-22HouseHouse Committee Favorably Reported
2017-03-20HouseHouse Second Readers
2017-03-16HouseHouse First Readers
2017-03-15HouseHouse Hopper

Georgia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback