GA HB593 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 8 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-12 - House Third Reading Lost
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 8 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-12 - House Third Reading Lost
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Title 47 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to retirement and pensions, so as to create the Tax Commissioners Retirement Fund of Georgia; to provide for a board; to provide for appointments and officers; to provide for powers and duties; to provide for eligibility, membership, dues, and benefits; to provide for a charge on delinquent or defaulted tax notices; to provide for the collection and remittance of such amounts; to provide for refunds of contributions with interest; to provide for conditions; to provide for definitions; to provide for related matters; to provide conditions for an effective date and automatic repeal; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Tax Commissioners Retirement Fund of Georgia; create
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-12 - House - House Vote #622 (Y: 72 N: 83 NV: 8 Abs: 17) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-12 | House | House Third Reading Lost |
2020-03-12 | House | House Third Readers |
2020-01-15 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported |
2019-03-13 | House | House Second Readers |
2019-03-11 | House | House First Readers |
2019-03-08 | House | House Hopper |
Georgia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.ga.gov/legislation/55795 |
Text | https://www.legis.ga.gov/api/legislation/document/20192020/184254 |
Roll Call | https://www.legis.ga.gov/legislation/55795#17669 |