GA HB591 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-2)
Status: Passed on May 10 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-10 - Effective Date 2021-07-01
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-2)
Status: Passed on May 10 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-10 - Effective Date 2021-07-01
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Title 37 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to mental health, so as to authorize marriage and family therapists to perform certain acts which physicians, psychologists, and others are authorized to perform regarding emergency examinations of persons for involuntary evaluation and treatment for mental illness or alcohol or drug abuse; to define certain terms; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Mental health; marriage and family therapists to perform certain acts which physicians and others are authorized to perform; authorize
Sponsors
Rep. Don Hogan [R] | Rep. Noel Williams [R] | Rep. Steven Meeks [R] | Rep. Debbie Buckner [D] |
Rep. J Collins [R] | Rep. Mary Oliver [D] | Sen. Kay Kirkpatrick [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-03-31 - House - Agree Sen Sub: House Vote #439 (Y: 163 N: 1 NV: 10 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2021-03-31 - Senate - Passage By Substitute: Senate Vote #428 (Y: 35 N: 14 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2021-03-05 - House - Passage: House Vote #173 (Y: 157 N: 3 NV: 6 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2021-03-31 - Senate - Passage By Substitute: Senate Vote #428 (Y: 35 N: 14 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2021-03-05 - House - Passage: House Vote #173 (Y: 157 N: 3 NV: 6 Abs: 13) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-10 | Effective Date 2021-07-01 | |
2021-05-10 | Act 280 | |
2021-05-10 | House | House Date Signed by Governor |
2021-04-07 | House | House Sent to Governor |
2021-03-31 | House | House Agreed Senate Amend or Sub |
2021-03-31 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2021-03-31 | Senate | Senate Taken from Table |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Senate Tabled |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Senate Taken from Table |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Senate Tabled |
2021-03-25 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2021-03-25 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2021-03-08 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2021-03-05 | House | House Passed/Adopted |
2021-03-05 | House | House Third Readers |
2021-03-03 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported |
2021-02-24 | House | House Second Readers |
2021-02-23 | House | House First Readers |
2021-02-22 | House | House Hopper |