GA HB59 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 3 2017 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-03-29 - House Disagreed Senate Amend or Sub
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Code Section 48-7-29.8 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to tax credits for the rehabilitation of historic structures, so as to revise procedures, conditions, and limitations; to provide for related matters; to provide an effective date; to provide for applicability; to provide for a sunset date; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Revenue and taxation; tax credits for rehabilitation of historic structures; revise procedures, conditions, and limitations

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-29 - House - House Vote #859 (Y: 25 N: 127 NV: 25 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2018-03-29 - House - House Vote #860 (Y: 17 N: 132 NV: 28 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2018-03-27 - Senate - Senate Vote #693 (Y: 36 N: 15 NV: 3 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-03-27 - Senate - Senate Vote #706 (Y: 46 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-03-03 - House - House Vote #208 (Y: 139 N: 27 NV: 7 Abs: 7) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-29HouseHouse Disagreed Senate Amend or Sub
2018-03-27SenateSenate Passed/Adopted By Substitute
2018-03-27SenateSenate Third Read
2018-03-27SenateSenate Engrossed
2018-03-19SenateSenate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
2018-01-08SenateSenate Recommitted
2017-03-22SenateSenate Read Second Time
2017-03-22SenateSenate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
2017-03-06SenateSenate Read and Referred
2017-03-03HouseHouse Passed/Adopted By Substitute
2017-03-03HouseHouse Third Readers
2017-02-27HouseHouse Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
2017-01-24HouseHouse Second Readers
2017-01-23HouseHouse First Readers
2017-01-12HouseHouse Hopper

Georgia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.legis.ga.gov/Legislation/en-US/display/20172018/HB/59
Texthttp://www.legis.ga.gov/Legislation/20172018/162835.pdf
Texthttp://www.legis.ga.gov/Legislation/20172018/166971.pdf
Texthttp://www.legis.ga.gov/Legislation/20172018/167618.pdf
Texthttp://www.legis.ga.gov/Legislation/20172018/169054.pdf
Texthttp://www.legis.ga.gov/Legislation/20172018/176743.pdf
Texthttp://www.legis.ga.gov/Legislation/20172018/178721.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.ga.gov/Legislation/en-US/vote.aspx?VoteID=15036
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.ga.gov/Legislation/en-US/vote.aspx?VoteID=16211
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.ga.gov/Legislation/en-US/vote.aspx?VoteID=16198
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.ga.gov/Legislation/en-US/vote.aspx?VoteID=16308
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.ga.gov/Legislation/en-US/vote.aspx?VoteID=16307

Bill Comments

feedback