GA HB587 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-2)
Status: Engrossed on March 3 2021 - 50% progression
Action: 2021-03-29 - Senate Tabled
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Title 48 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to revenue and taxation, so as to provide for a tax credit for medical equipment and supplies manufacturers and pharmaceutical and medicine manufacturers; to amend Code Section 33-1-25 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to the "Georgia Agribusiness and Rural Jobs Act," so as to provide for a second round of funding and period for applications; to increase an application fee and provide for an annual maintenance fee; change certain reporting requirements; to revise and provide for definitions; to amend Code Section 48-7-40.34 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to tax credit for Class III railroads and reporting, so as to extend an income tax credit for expenditures on the maintenance of railroad track owned or leased by Class III railroads; to provide for a short title; to provide for related matters; to provide for an effective date; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Georgia Economic Renewal Act of 2021; enact

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-03-29 - Senate - Motion To Engross: Hb 32, Hb 282, Hb 317, Hb 477, Hb 517, & Hb 587: Senate Vote #298 (Y: 36 N: 16 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-03-03 - House - Passage: House Vote #135 (Y: 157 N: 14 NV: 2 Abs: 6) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-03-29SenateSenate Tabled
2021-03-29SenateSenate Engrossed
2021-03-25SenateSenate Read Second Time
2021-03-25SenateSenate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
2021-03-05SenateSenate Read and Referred
2021-03-03HouseHouse Passed/Adopted By Substitute
2021-03-03HouseHouse Third Readers
2021-02-26HouseHouse Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
2021-02-24HouseHouse Second Readers
2021-02-23HouseHouse First Readers
2021-02-22HouseHouse Hopper

Georgia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback