GA HB585 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on February 22 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-02-08 - House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 22 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-02-08 - House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Code Section 40-2-86 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to special license plates promoting or supporting certain worthy agencies, funds, or nonprofit corporations with proceeds disbursed to the general fund and the agency, fund, or nonprofit corporation, so as to establish a specialty license plate honoring Kappa Alpha Psi Fraternity, Inc.; to provide for related matters; to provide for compliance with constitutional requirements; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Special license plates; Kappa Alpha Psi, Inc.; establish
Sponsors
Rep. William Boddie [D] | Rep. Brian Prince [D] | Rep. Kimberly Alexander [D] | Rep. Derrick Jackson [D] |
Sen. Derek Mallow [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-08 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2021-02-24 | House | House Second Readers |
2021-02-23 | House | House First Readers |
2021-02-22 | House | House Hopper |