GA HB585 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 13 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-03-22 - Senate Passed/Adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

A BILL To be entitled an Act to amend an Act creating a board of commissioners in and for Miller County, approved March 29, 1983 (Ga. L. 1983, p. 4594), as amended, particularly by an Act approved April 16, 1999, (Ga. L. 1999, p. 4442), so as to revise the districts for the election of members of the board of commissioners; to provide for definitions and inclusions; to provide for method of election; to provide for the continuation in office of current members; to provide for related matters; to provide for effective dates; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Miller County; Board of Commissioners; revise the districts for the election of members

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-22 - Senate - Senate Vote #217 (Y: 43 N: 2 NV: 3 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2019-03-13 - House - House Vote #228 (Y: 159 N: 0 NV: 12 Abs: 7) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-22SenateSenate Passed/Adopted
2019-03-22SenateSenate Committee Favorably Reported
2019-03-14SenateSenate Read and Referred
2019-03-13HouseHouse Passed/Adopted
2019-03-13HouseHouse Third Readers
2019-03-13HouseHouse Committee Favorably Reported
2019-03-11HouseHouse Second Readers
2019-03-08HouseHouse First Readers
2019-03-07HouseHouse Hopper

Georgia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback