GA HB583 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 29 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-03-20 - Senate Read Second Time
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Chapter 2 of Title 26 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to standards, labeling, and adulteration of food, so as to authorize the production and sale of homemade food items with certain exemptions, requirements, and disclosures; to provide for definitions; to provide for licensing and inspections; to provide for a civil penalty; to provide for conforming changes; to amend Chapter 60 of Title 36 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to general provisions applicable to counties and municipal corporations, so as to prohibit local regulation of homemade food items; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Food, drugs, and cosmetics; authorize production and sale of homemade food items with certain exemptions, requirements, and disclosures

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2024-02-29 - House - Passage: House Vote #647 (Y: 166 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 8) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2024-03-20SenateSenate Read Second Time
2024-03-20SenateSenate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
2024-03-04SenateSenate Read and Referred
2024-02-29HouseHouse Passed/Adopted By Substitute
2024-02-29HouseHouse Third Readers
2024-02-26HouseHouse Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
2023-02-28HouseHouse Second Readers
2023-02-27HouseHouse First Readers
2023-02-23HouseHouse Hopper

Georgia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback