GA HB582 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on May 12 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-12 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on May 12 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-12 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend an Act creating the Coweta County Water and Sewerage Authority, approved March 20, 2001 (Ga. L. 2001, p. 3539), as amended, particularly by an Act approved May 16, 2007 (Ga. L. 2007, p. 3668), so as to change the terms of members of the authority; to change the quorum; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Coweta County Water and Sewerage Authority; members of authority; change terms
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-03-23 - Senate - Senate Vote #178 (Y: 51 N: 2 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-18 - House - House Vote #263 (Y: 162 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2015-03-18 - House - House Vote #263 (Y: 162 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-12 | Effective Date | |
2015-05-12 | Act 258 | |
2015-05-12 | House | House Date Signed by Governor |
2015-04-06 | House | House Sent to Governor |
2015-03-23 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted |
2015-03-23 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2015-03-19 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2015-03-18 | House | House Passed/Adopted |
2015-03-18 | House | House Third Readers |
2015-03-18 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported |
2015-03-13 | House | House Second Readers |
2015-03-11 | House | House First Readers |
2015-03-09 | House | House Hopper |