GA HB579 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-1)
Status: Passed on May 10 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-10 - Effective Date 2021-07-01
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-1)
Status: Passed on May 10 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-10 - Effective Date 2021-07-01
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Chapter 75 of Title 36 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to war on terrorism local assistance, so as to change a short title to the "Public Safety and Judicial Facilities Act"; to repeal the requirement for referendums prior to issuance of bonded indebtedness for new projects; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Public Safety and Judicial Facilities Act; enact
Sponsors
Rep. Mary Oliver [D] | Rep. Chuck Efstration [R] | Rep. Matthew Wilson [D] | Rep. Karla Drenner [D] |
Rep. Zulma Lopez [D] | Rep. Karen Bennett [D] | Rep. Becky Evans [D] | Sen. Emanuel Jones [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-03-31 - Senate - Passage: Senate Vote #431 (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-03-08 - House - Passage: House Vote #212 (Y: 169 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-03-08 - House - Passage: House Vote #212 (Y: 169 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-10 | Effective Date 2021-07-01 | |
2021-05-10 | Act 279 | |
2021-05-10 | House | House Date Signed by Governor |
2021-04-07 | House | House Sent to Governor |
2021-03-31 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted |
2021-03-31 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2021-03-31 | Senate | Senate Taken from Table |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Senate Tabled |
2021-03-25 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2021-03-25 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2021-03-09 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2021-03-08 | House | House Passed/Adopted |
2021-03-08 | House | House Third Readers |
2021-03-03 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported |
2021-02-24 | House | House Second Readers |
2021-02-23 | House | House First Readers |
2021-02-22 | House | House Hopper |