GA HB576 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 6 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 6 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to create a board of elections and registration for Wilcox County and to provide for its powers and duties; to provide for definitions; to provide for related matters; to provide for submission for preclearance under Section 5 of the federal Voting Rights Act of 1965, as amended; to provide effective dates; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Wilcox County; board of elections and registration; create
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-03-22 - Senate - Senate Vote #222 (Y: 44 N: 1 NV: 7 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2013-03-14 - House - House Vote #292 (Y: 151 N: 1 NV: 17 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2013-03-14 - House - House Vote #292 (Y: 151 N: 1 NV: 17 Abs: 11) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-07-01 | Effective Date | |
2013-05-06 | Act 140 | |
2013-05-06 | House | House Date Signed by Governor |
2013-04-02 | House | House Sent to Governor |
2013-03-22 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted |
2013-03-22 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2013-03-20 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2013-03-14 | House | House Passed/Adopted |
2013-03-14 | House | House Third Readers |
2013-03-14 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported |
2013-03-13 | House | House Second Readers |
2013-03-12 | House | House First Readers |
2013-03-11 | House | House Hopper |