GA HB575 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on May 8 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on May 8 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to authorize the governing authority of the City of Brookhaven to levy an excise tax pursuant to the authority of subsection (b) of Code Section 48-13-51 of the O.C.G.A.; to provide procedures, conditions, and limitations; to provide for related matters; to provide for a conditional effective date and automatic repeal; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Brookhaven, City of; levy an excise tax
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-03-24 - Senate - Senate Vote #224 (Y: 44 N: 1 NV: 9 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-16 - House - House Vote #273 (Y: 157 N: 1 NV: 13 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2017-03-16 - House - House Vote #273 (Y: 157 N: 1 NV: 13 Abs: 9) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-07-01 | Effective Date | |
2017-05-08 | Act 213 | |
2017-05-08 | House | House Date Signed by Governor |
2017-04-04 | House | House Sent to Governor |
2017-03-24 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted |
2017-03-24 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2017-03-20 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2017-03-16 | House | House Passed/Adopted |
2017-03-16 | House | House Third Readers |
2017-03-16 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported |
2017-03-15 | House | House Second Readers |
2017-03-14 | House | House First Readers |
2017-03-13 | House | House Hopper |