GA HB574 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 12 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-12 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 12 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-12 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend an Act providing an annual salary for the Sheriff of Twiggs County in lieu of the fee system of compensation, approved February 28, 1966 (Ga. L. 1966, p. 2546), as amended, particularly by an Act approved March 31, 1992 (Ga. L. 1992, p. 5140), so as to change the manner of fixing the compensation of employees of the sheriff's office; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Twiggs County; manner of fixing compensation of employees of sheriff's office; change
Sponsors
Rep. James Epps [R] |
Roll Calls
2015-03-20 - Senate - Senate Vote #168 (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-03-18 - House - House Vote #263 (Y: 162 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2015-03-18 - House - House Vote #263 (Y: 162 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-12 | Effective Date | |
2015-05-12 | Act 256 | |
2015-05-12 | House | House Date Signed by Governor |
2015-04-06 | House | House Sent to Governor |
2015-03-20 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted |
2015-03-20 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2015-03-19 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2015-03-18 | House | House Passed/Adopted |
2015-03-18 | House | House Third Readers |
2015-03-18 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported |
2015-03-13 | House | House Second Readers |
2015-03-11 | House | House First Readers |
2015-03-09 | House | House Hopper |