GA HB572 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 4 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-04 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend an Act providing for a chief judge of the Recorder's Court of Chatham County, approved March 31, 1987 (Ga. L. 1987, p. 5156), as amended, particularly by an Act approved March 27, 1998 (Ga. L. 1998, p. 3557), so as to revise the responsibilities of the chief judge; to revise the method of selection of the chief judge; to provide for a court administrator; to provide for the hiring and discharge of same; to provide for the court administrator's responsibilities; to require the court administrator to provide a bond; to provide personnel policies and procedures of employees of the court; to authorize the adoption of rules, policies, or regulations; to provide for judges pro tempore; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Chatham County; Recorder's Court; revise responsibilities of chief judge; provisions

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-03-20 - Senate - Senate Vote #202 (Y: 46 N: 2 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-15 - House - House Vote #269 (Y: 155 N: 0 NV: 16 Abs: 9) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-04 Effective Date
2017-05-04 Act 144
2017-05-04HouseHouse Date Signed by Governor
2017-04-04HouseHouse Sent to Governor
2017-03-20SenateSenate Passed/Adopted
2017-03-20SenateSenate Committee Favorably Reported
2017-03-16SenateSenate Read and Referred
2017-03-15HouseHouse Passed/Adopted
2017-03-15HouseHouse Third Readers
2017-03-15HouseHouse Committee Favorably Reported
2017-03-14HouseHouse Second Readers
2017-03-13HouseHouse First Readers
2017-03-10HouseHouse Hopper

Georgia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback