GA HB571 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Passed on May 3 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Passed on May 3 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Chapter 25 of Title 47 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to the Magistrates Retirement Fund, so as to provide that a member in arrears for dues payments for a period of 90 days shall be suspended from the fund and must apply for reinstatement; to provide for elections for designated survivor's benefits; to provide that certain retired members may become employed in a certain position and continue to receive benefits; to provide for related matters; to provide conditions for an effective date and automatic repeal; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Magistrates Retirement Fund; member in arrears for dues payments for 90 days shall be suspended; provisions
Sponsors
Sen. Sam Watson [R] | Rep. Howard Maxwell [R] | Rep. Paul Battles [R] | Rep. Gerald Greene [R] |
Rep. John Corbett [R] | Sen. Ellis Black [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-03-23 - Senate - Senate Vote #682 (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2018-02-07 - House - House Vote #473 (Y: 159 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2018-02-07 - House - House Vote #473 (Y: 159 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 12) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-07-01 | Effective Date | |
2018-05-03 | Act 321 | |
2018-05-03 | House | House Date Signed by Governor |
2018-04-02 | House | House Sent to Governor |
2018-03-23 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted |
2018-03-23 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2018-03-09 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2018-03-07 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2018-02-08 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2018-02-07 | House | House Passed/Adopted |
2018-02-07 | House | House Third Readers |
2018-01-25 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported |
2017-03-14 | House | House Second Readers |
2017-03-13 | House | House First Readers |
2017-03-10 | House | House Hopper |