GA HB561 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 3 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-03 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend an Act providing a new charter for the City of Springfield, approved April 11, 2012 (Ga. L. 2012, p. 4840), so as to provide for corporate boundaries; to provide for members of the city council; to provide for political activities of officers and employees; to provide for organizational meetings; to provide for ordinances; to provide for a mayor pro tempore; to provide for administrative and service departments; to provide for a city attorney; to provide for jurisdiction of the municipal court; to provide for appellate review; to provide for an operating budget; to provide for capital improvements; to provide for purchasing; to provide for sale and lease of property; to provide for bonds for officials; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Springfield, City of; provide for corporate boundaries; provisions

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-03-22 - Senate - Senate Vote #213 (Y: 52 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-03-14 - House - House Vote #265 (Y: 160 N: 0 NV: 14 Abs: 6) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-03 Effective Date
2017-05-03 Act 132
2017-05-03HouseHouse Date Signed by Governor
2017-04-04HouseHouse Sent to Governor
2017-03-22SenateSenate Passed/Adopted
2017-03-22SenateSenate Committee Favorably Reported
2017-03-15SenateSenate Read and Referred
2017-03-14HouseHouse Passed/Adopted
2017-03-14HouseHouse Third Readers
2017-03-14HouseHouse Committee Favorably Reported
2017-03-13HouseHouse Second Readers
2017-03-10HouseHouse First Readers
2017-03-09HouseHouse Hopper

Georgia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback