GA HB560 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 3 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-03 - Effective Date 2021-05-03
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 3 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-03 - Effective Date 2021-05-03
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend an Act creating the Board of Commissioners of Thomas County, approved December 1, 1898 (Ga. L. 1898, p. 378), as amended, so as to modify the compensation of the commissioners on the Thomas County Board of Commissioners; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Thomas County; Board of Commissioners; modify compensation
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-05 - Senate - Local Consent Calendar: Senate Vote #126 (Y: 47 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2021-02-26 - House - Local Calendar: House Vote #103 (Y: 154 N: 0 NV: 12 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2021-02-26 - House - Local Calendar: House Vote #103 (Y: 154 N: 0 NV: 12 Abs: 13) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-03 | Effective Date 2021-05-03 | |
2021-05-03 | Act 63 | |
2021-05-03 | House | House Date Signed by Governor |
2021-04-05 | House | House Sent to Governor |
2021-03-05 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted |
2021-03-05 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2021-03-01 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2021-02-26 | House | House Passed/Adopted |
2021-02-26 | House | House Third Readers |
2021-02-26 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported |
2021-02-23 | House | House Second Readers |
2021-02-22 | House | House First Readers |
2021-02-18 | House | House Hopper |