GA HB557 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 11 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-03-22 - Senate Passed/Adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend an Act creating a new board of education of Grady County, approved March 5, 1968 (Ga. L. 1968, p. 2120), as amended, so as to increase the compensation of the members of the board of education; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Grady County; board of education; increase compensation of members

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-22 - Senate - Senate Vote #217 (Y: 43 N: 2 NV: 3 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2019-03-11 - House - House Vote #226 (Y: 152 N: 0 NV: 17 Abs: 9) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-22SenateSenate Passed/Adopted
2019-03-22SenateSenate Committee Favorably Reported
2019-03-13SenateSenate Read and Referred
2019-03-11HouseHouse Passed/Adopted
2019-03-11HouseHouse Third Readers
2019-03-11HouseHouse Committee Favorably Reported
2019-03-07HouseHouse Second Readers
2019-03-05HouseHouse First Readers
2019-03-04HouseHouse Hopper

Georgia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback