GA HB557 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on May 3 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-03 - Act 319
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend an Act placing the judge of the Probate Court of Clayton County on an annual salary, approved February 7, 1950 (Ga. L. 1950, p. 2068), as amended, particularly by an Act approved May 5, 2006 (Ga. L. 2006, p. 4662), so as to change the compensation of the judge of the probate court; to provide for an effective date; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Clayton County; Probate Court; change compensation of judge

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-12 - Senate - Senate Vote #595 (Y: 44 N: 2 NV: 3 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2017-03-13 - House - House Vote #262 (Y: 146 N: 0 NV: 21 Abs: 13) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-03 Act 319
2018-05-03HouseHouse Date Signed by Governor
2018-04-02HouseHouse Sent to Governor
2018-03-12SenateSenate Passed/Adopted
2018-03-12SenateSenate Committee Favorably Reported
2017-03-14SenateSenate Read and Referred
2017-03-13HouseHouse Passed/Adopted
2017-03-13HouseHouse Third Readers
2017-03-13HouseHouse Committee Favorably Reported
2017-03-10HouseHouse Second Readers
2017-03-09HouseHouse First Readers
2017-03-06HouseHouse Hopper

Georgia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback