GA HB557 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 30 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-30 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend an Act to provide a new charter for the City of Danielsville, approved March 27, 1998 (Ga. L. 1998, p. 3632), as amended, particularly by an Act approved April 9, 1999 (Ga. L. 1999, p. 3714), so as to provide for staggered, four-year terms for the mayor and council; to provide that the city clerk may serve as the city treasurer; to provide that the municipal judge shall be a licensed attorney; to provide that the office of elected officials of the city shall be vacated under certain circumstances; to provide for related matters; to provide for submission under Section 5 of the federal Voting Rights Act of 1965, as amended; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Danielsville, City of; provide for staggered, four-year terms for mayor and council

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2013-03-20 - Senate - Senate Vote #188 (Y: 42 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2013-03-13 - House - House Vote #290 (Y: 164 N: 3 NV: 8 Abs: 5) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2013-04-30 Effective Date
2013-04-30 Act 117
2013-04-30HouseHouse Date Signed by Governor
2013-04-02HouseHouse Sent to Governor
2013-03-20SenateSenate Passed/Adopted
2013-03-20SenateSenate Committee Favorably Reported
2013-03-14SenateSenate Read and Referred
2013-03-13HouseHouse Passed/Adopted
2013-03-13HouseHouse Third Readers
2013-03-13HouseHouse Committee Favorably Reported
2013-03-12HouseHouse Second Readers
2013-03-11HouseHouse First Readers
2013-03-07HouseHouse Hopper

Georgia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback