GA HB557 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 11 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-11 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend an Act to create a board of commissioners of roads and revenues for the county of Monroe, approved August 19, 1907 (Ga. L. 1907, p. 318), as amended, so as to reconstitute such board; to provide for its composition, manner of election, and filling of vacancies; to provide for its officers and powers and duties; to provide for its personnel and compensation; to provide for disbursements, audits, and certain operations; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Monroe County; board of commissioners of roads and revenues; reconstitute

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2011-03-30 - Senate - Senate Vote #222 - Local Consent Calendar (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2011-03-22 - House - House Vote #220 - Local Calendar (Y: 157 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 10) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2011-05-11 Effective Date
2011-05-11 Act 145
2011-05-11 House Date Signed by Governor
2011-04-19 House Sent to Governor
2011-03-30 Senate Passed/Adopted
2011-03-30 Senate Committee Favorably Reported
2011-03-23 Senate Read and Referred
2011-03-22 House Passed/Adopted
2011-03-22 House Third Readers
2011-03-22 House Committee Favorably Reported
2011-03-21 House Second Readers
2011-03-16 House First Readers

Georgia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback