GA HB553 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Passed on May 7 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Passed on May 7 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Code Sections 35-6-2 and 49-5-281 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to the membership of the State Victim Services Commission and the bill of rights for foster parents, respectively, so as to delete references to an obsolete entity; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
State Victim Services Commission; bill of rights for foster parents; delete references to an obsolete entity
Sponsors
Rep. Katie Dempsey [R] | Rep. Sharon Cooper [R] | Rep. Mary Oliver [D] | Rep. Andrew Welch [R] |
Rep. Penny Houston [R] | Sen. Matt Brass [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-04-02 - Senate - Senate Vote #389 (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-07 - House - House Vote #207 (Y: 162 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2019-03-07 - House - House Vote #207 (Y: 162 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 13) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-07-01 | Effective Date | |
2019-05-07 | Act 296 | |
2019-05-07 | House | House Date Signed by Governor |
2019-04-11 | House | House Sent to Governor |
2019-04-02 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted |
2019-04-02 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2019-04-02 | Senate | Senate Taken from Table |
2019-03-29 | Senate | Senate Tabled |
2019-03-22 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2019-03-21 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2019-03-08 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2019-03-07 | House | House Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2019-03-07 | House | House Third Readers |
2019-03-05 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2019-03-04 | House | House Second Readers |
2019-03-01 | House | House First Readers |
2019-02-28 | House | House Hopper |