GA HB55 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on December 21 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-01-26 - House Second Readers
Pending: House Industry and Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Chapter 1 of Title 34 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to general provisions of labor and industrial relations, so as to prohibit an employer from seeking salary history information about an applicant during the hiring process; to provide for definitions; to provide for applicability and exceptions; to impose a civil penalty for violations; to provide for a civil right of action and the recovery of attorneys' fees and costs of litigation; to provide for related matters; to provide for an effective date; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Labor and industrial relations; hiring process of applicant; prohibit employer from seeking salary history information

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-01-26HouseHouse Second Readers
2021-01-14HouseHouse First Readers
2021-01-13HouseHouse Hopper
2020-12-21HouseHouse Prefiled

Georgia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback