GA HB549 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Vetoed on May 8 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-08 - Veto V6
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend an Act to provide a new charter for the City of Lovejoy in the County of Clayton, approved March 31, 1976 (Ga. L. 1976, p. 3897), as amended, so as to provide for a governing authority; to create districts for the election of members of the governing authority; to provide for definitions and inclusions; to provide for method of election; to provide for the continuation in office of current members; to provide for related matters; to provide for effective dates; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Lovejoy, City of; provide for a governing authority

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-12 - Senate - Senate Vote #595 (Y: 44 N: 2 NV: 3 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2017-03-14 - House - House Vote #265 (Y: 160 N: 0 NV: 14 Abs: 6) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-08 Veto V6
2018-05-08HouseHouse Date Signed by Governor
2018-04-02HouseHouse Sent to Governor
2018-03-12SenateSenate Passed/Adopted
2018-03-12SenateSenate Committee Favorably Reported
2017-03-15SenateSenate Read and Referred
2017-03-14HouseHouse Passed/Adopted By Substitute
2017-03-14HouseHouse Third Readers
2017-03-14HouseHouse Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
2017-03-10HouseHouse Second Readers
2017-03-09HouseHouse First Readers
2017-03-06HouseHouse Hopper

Georgia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback