GA HB548 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on May 3 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-03 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend an Act to incorporate the City of Riverdale, approved February 13, 1956 (Ga. L. 1956, p. 2205), as amended, so as to provide for a governing authority; to create wards for the election of members of the governing authority; to provide for definitions and inclusions; to provide for method of election and filling vacancies; to provide for the continuation in office of current members; to provide for related matters; to provide for effective dates; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Riverdale, City of; provide for a governing authority

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-03-22 - Senate - Senate Vote #213 (Y: 52 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-03-14 - House - House Vote #265 (Y: 160 N: 0 NV: 14 Abs: 6) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-03 Effective Date
2017-05-03 Act 125
2017-05-03HouseHouse Date Signed by Governor
2017-04-04HouseHouse Sent to Governor
2017-03-22SenateSenate Passed/Adopted
2017-03-22SenateSenate Committee Favorably Reported
2017-03-15SenateSenate Read and Referred
2017-03-14HouseHouse Passed/Adopted By Substitute
2017-03-14HouseHouse Third Readers
2017-03-14HouseHouse Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
2017-03-10HouseHouse Second Readers
2017-03-09HouseHouse First Readers
2017-03-06HouseHouse Hopper

Georgia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback