GA HB544 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Engrossed on March 8 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-09 - Senate Read and Referred
Pending: Senate Regulated Industries and Utilities Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Chapter 27 of Title 50 of the O.C.G.A., relating to lottery for education, so as to change the composition of the board of directors of the lottery; to comprehensively revise Article 3, relating to bona fide coin operated amusement machines; to provide for an effective date; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

State government; composition of the board of directors of the lottery; change

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-03-08 - House - Passage: House Vote #199 (Y: 110 N: 54 NV: 11 Abs: 4) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-03-09SenateSenate Read and Referred
2021-03-08HouseHouse Passed/Adopted By Substitute
2021-03-08HouseHouse Third Readers
2021-02-26HouseHouse Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
2021-02-23HouseHouse Second Readers
2021-02-22HouseHouse First Readers
2021-02-18HouseHouse Hopper

Georgia State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback