GA HB540 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 7 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-29 - Senate Passed/Adopted By Substitute
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 7 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-29 - Senate Passed/Adopted By Substitute
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Code Section 33-1-18 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to housing tax credit for qualified projects and rules and regulations, so as to add to the list of tax categories eligible for an offset by the housing tax credit; to provide an effective date; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Housing tax credit; add to the list of tax categories eligible for an offset
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-29 - Senate - Senate Vote #314 (Y: 36 N: 18 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-29 - Senate - Senate Vote #340 (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-03-07 - House - House Vote #209 (Y: 149 N: 10 NV: 10 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2019-03-29 - Senate - Senate Vote #340 (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-03-07 - House - House Vote #209 (Y: 149 N: 10 NV: 10 Abs: 9) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-29 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2019-03-29 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2019-03-29 | Senate | Senate Engrossed |
2019-03-26 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2019-03-26 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2019-03-08 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2019-03-07 | House | House Passed/Adopted |
2019-03-07 | House | House Third Readers |
2019-03-07 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported |
2019-03-05 | House | House Withdrawn, Recommitted |
2019-03-04 | House | House Second Readers |
2019-03-01 | House | House First Readers |
2019-02-28 | House | House Hopper |