GA HB534 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Passed on May 3 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-03 - Effective Date 2021-05-03
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Passed on May 3 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-03 - Effective Date 2021-05-03
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Article 2 of Chapter 11 of Title 16 of the O.C.G.A., relating to offenses against public order, so as to provide for the offense of promoting illegal drag racing and laying drags; to provide for punishment; to amend Title 40 of the O.C.G.A., relating to motor vehicles and traffic, so as to provide for the offense of reckless stunt driving; to provide for report of conviction of such offenses by courts to the Department of Driver Services; to provide for related matters; to provide for an effective date and applicability; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Crimes and offenses; promoting illegal drag racing and laying drags; provide for offense
Sponsors
Rep. Josh Bonner [R] | Rep. Bill Hitchens [R] | Rep. Martin Momtahan [R] | Rep. John Corbett [R] |
Rep. Matt Barton [R] | Sen. Emanuel Jones [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-03-29 - Senate - Passage: Senate Vote #325 (Y: 46 N: 3 NV: 2 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-03-08 - House - Passage: House Vote #217 (Y: 130 N: 39 NV: 5 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-03-08 - House - Passage: House Vote #217 (Y: 130 N: 39 NV: 5 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-03 | Effective Date 2021-05-03 | |
2021-05-03 | Act 152 | |
2021-05-03 | House | House Date Signed by Governor |
2021-04-06 | House | House Sent to Governor |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Senate Taken from Table |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Senate Tabled |
2021-03-22 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2021-03-18 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2021-03-09 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2021-03-08 | House | House Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2021-03-08 | House | House Third Readers |
2021-03-05 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2021-02-23 | House | House Second Readers |
2021-02-22 | House | House First Readers |
2021-02-18 | House | House Hopper |