GA HB528 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 6-1)
Status: Passed on May 3 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-03 - Effective Date 2024-01-01
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 6-1)
Status: Passed on May 3 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-03 - Effective Date 2024-01-01
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Article 15 of Chapter 1 of Title 10 of the O.C.G.A., relating to deceptive or unfair trade practices, so as to enact the "Georgia Online Automatic Renewal Transparency Act"; to provide for related matters; to provide for an effective date; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Georgia Online Automatic Renewal Transparency Act; enact
Sponsors
Rep. Houston Gaines [R] | Rep. Steven Sainz [R] | Rep. Tyler Smith [R] | Rep. Marcus Wiedower [R] |
Rep. James Burchett [R] | Rep. Leesa Hagan [R] | Sen. Elena Parent [D] |
Roll Calls
2023-03-29 - House - Agree To Senate Substitute: House Vote #379 (Y: 163 N: 2 NV: 7 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2023-03-29 - Senate - Passage By Substitute: Senate Vote #375 (Y: 49 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2023-03-06 - House - Passage: House Vote #188 (Y: 173 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-03-29 - Senate - Passage By Substitute: Senate Vote #375 (Y: 49 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2023-03-06 - House - Passage: House Vote #188 (Y: 173 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-03 | Effective Date 2024-01-01 | |
2023-05-03 | Act 336 | |
2023-05-03 | House | House Date Signed by Governor |
2023-04-06 | House | House Sent to Governor |
2023-03-29 | House | House Agreed Senate Amend or Sub |
2023-03-29 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2023-03-29 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2023-03-29 | Senate | Senate Taken from Table |
2023-03-27 | Senate | Senate Tabled |
2023-03-20 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2023-03-16 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2023-03-07 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2023-03-06 | House | House Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2023-03-06 | House | House Third Readers |
2023-03-01 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2023-02-23 | House | House Second Readers |
2023-02-22 | House | House First Readers |
2023-02-21 | House | House Hopper |