GA HB523 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Introduced on February 27 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-05 - House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 27 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-05 - House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Title 36 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to local government, so as to prohibit local governments from regulating the use of certain real estate as short-term rental property; to provide for definitions; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Local government; regulating the use of certain real estate as short-term rental property; prohibit
Sponsors
Rep. Kasey Carpenter [R] | Rep. Alan Powell [R] | Rep. Dale Washburn [R] | Rep. Dale Rutledge [R] |
Rep. Philip Singleton [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-05 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2019-03-01 | House | House Second Readers |
2019-02-28 | House | House First Readers |
2019-02-27 | House | House Hopper |