GA HB517 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Passed on April 28 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-28 - Act 722
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Chapter 2A of Title 20 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to student scholarship organizations, so as to provide for the inclusion of earned interest in the calculation of minimum revenue obligations for scholarships and tuition grants; to require that student scholarship organization audits are conducted in accordance with generally accepted auditing standards; to amend Code Section 48-7-29.16, relating to qualified education tax credits, so as to increase the limit available to individuals, heads of household, married couples filing joint returns, and individuals who are members of certain limited liability companies, shareholders of Subchapter "S" corporations, or partners in a partnership; to provide for related matters; to provide for an effective date and applicability; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Education; calculation of minimum revenue obligations for scholarships and tuition grants; provide for the inclusion of earned interest

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2022-04-04 - House - Adopt Ccr: House Vote #903 (Y: 98 N: 68 NV: 4 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2022-04-04 - Senate - Adopt Conference Committee Report: Senate Vote #865 (Y: 30 N: 21 NV: 3 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-04-04 - Senate - Motion For Reconsideration: Senate Vote #864 (Y: 30 N: 20 NV: 3 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-04-04 - Senate - Adopt Conference Committee Report: Senate Vote #863 (Y: 28 N: 20 NV: 5 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-03-03 - House - Immediately Transmit: House Vote #592 (Y: 94 N: 63 NV: 12 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2022-03-03 - House - Agree To Senate Sub As Am: House Vote #591 (Y: 94 N: 66 NV: 10 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2021-03-31 - Senate - Passage By Substitute: Senate Vote #387 (Y: 30 N: 18 NV: 1 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2021-03-29 - Senate - Motion To Engross: Hb 32, Hb 282, Hb 317, Hb 477, Hb 517, & Hb 587: Senate Vote #298 (Y: 36 N: 16 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-03-08 - House - Passage: House Vote #206 (Y: 98 N: 71 NV: 6 Abs: 4) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2022-04-28 Act 722
2022-04-28HouseHouse Date Signed by Governor
2022-04-08HouseHouse Sent to Governor
2022-04-04HouseHouse Conference Committee Report Adopted
2022-04-04SenateSenate Conference Committee Report Adopted
2022-04-04SenateSenate Reconsidered
2022-04-04SenateSenate Conference Report Lost
2022-03-30SenateSenate Conference Committee Appointed 54th, 52nd, 18th
2022-03-30HouseHouse Conference Committee Appointed 46th, 28th, 29th
2022-03-30HouseHouse Insisted
2022-03-11SenateSenate Disagreed House Amend or Sub
2022-03-03HouseHouse Immediately Transmitted to Senate
2022-03-03HouseHouse Agreed Senate Amend or Sub As Amended
2021-03-31SenateSenate Passed/Adopted By Substitute
2021-03-31SenateSenate Third Read
2021-03-31SenateSenate Taken from Table
2021-03-29SenateSenate Tabled
2021-03-29SenateSenate Engrossed
2021-03-25SenateSenate Read Second Time
2021-03-25SenateSenate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
2021-03-09SenateSenate Read and Referred
2021-03-08HouseHouse Passed/Adopted By Substitute
2021-03-08HouseHouse Third Readers
2021-03-03HouseHouse Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
2021-02-22HouseHouse Second Readers
2021-02-18HouseHouse First Readers
2021-02-17HouseHouse Hopper

Georgia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.legis.ga.gov/legislation/59811
Texthttps://www.legis.ga.gov/api/legislation/document/20212022/197986
Texthttps://www.legis.ga.gov/api/legislation/document/20212022/199318
Texthttps://www.legis.ga.gov/api/legislation/document/20212022/199937
Texthttps://www.legis.ga.gov/api/legislation/document/20212022/201302
Texthttps://www.legis.ga.gov/api/legislation/document/20212022/212067
Texthttps://www.legis.ga.gov/api/legislation/document/20212022/212226
Amendmenthttps://www.legis.ga.gov/api/legislation/document/20212022/208106
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.ga.gov/legislation/59811#18425
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.ga.gov/legislation/59811#18708
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.ga.gov/legislation/59811#18889
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.ga.gov/legislation/59811#19288
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.ga.gov/legislation/59811#19292
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.ga.gov/legislation/59811#19889
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.ga.gov/legislation/59811#19890
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.ga.gov/legislation/59811#19891
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.ga.gov/legislation/59811#19792

Bill Comments

feedback