GA HB516 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Vetoed on May 10 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-10 - Veto V6
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Chapter 15 of Title 43 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to professional engineers and land surveyors, so as to provide for the profession of professional structural engineer; to provide for definitions; to provide for continuing education requirements; to provide for unlawful practices; to provide for the issuance of certificates of registration for such professionals; to provide for registration by comity; to provide for certificates of registration; to provide for use of a seal; to provide for exceptions; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Professions and businesses; profession of professional structural engineer; provide

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-02 - House - House Vote #401 (Y: 139 N: 17 NV: 10 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2019-04-02 - Senate - Senate Vote #423 (Y: 27 N: 25 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2019-04-02 - Senate - Senate Vote #424 (Y: 31 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-04-02 - Senate - Senate Vote #425 (Y: 30 N: 23 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-04-02 - Senate - Senate Vote #426 (Y: 29 N: 25 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-28 - Senate - Senate Vote #283 (Y: 48 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-03-07 - House - House Vote #190 (Y: 164 N: 4 NV: 5 Abs: 5) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-10 Veto V6
2019-05-10HouseHouse Date Signed by Governor
2019-04-11HouseHouse Sent to Governor
2019-04-02SenateSenate Agreed House Amend or Sub
2019-04-02SenateSenate Reconsidered
2019-04-02SenateSenate Agreed House Amend or Sub
2019-04-02HouseHouse Agreed Senate Amend or Sub As Amended
2019-03-28SenateSenate Passed/Adopted By Substitute
2019-03-28SenateSenate Third Read
2019-03-22SenateSenate Read Second Time
2019-03-21SenateSenate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
2019-03-08SenateSenate Read and Referred
2019-03-07HouseHouse Passed/Adopted
2019-03-07HouseHouse Third Readers
2019-03-04HouseHouse Committee Favorably Reported
2019-03-01HouseHouse Second Readers
2019-02-28HouseHouse First Readers
2019-02-27HouseHouse Hopper

Georgia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.legis.ga.gov/Legislation/en-US/display/20192020/HB/516
Texthttp://www.legis.ga.gov/Legislation/20192020/183091.pdf
Texthttp://www.legis.ga.gov/Legislation/20192020/185178.pdf
Texthttp://www.legis.ga.gov/Legislation/20192020/186430.pdf
Texthttp://www.legis.ga.gov/Legislation/20192020/187524.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.ga.gov/Legislation/en-US/vote.aspx?VoteID=16779
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.ga.gov/Legislation/en-US/vote.aspx?VoteID=17067
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.ga.gov/Legislation/en-US/vote.aspx?VoteID=17316
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.ga.gov/Legislation/en-US/vote.aspx?VoteID=17315
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.ga.gov/Legislation/en-US/vote.aspx?VoteID=17314
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.ga.gov/Legislation/en-US/vote.aspx?VoteID=17313
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.ga.gov/Legislation/en-US/vote.aspx?VoteID=17231

Bill Comments

feedback