GA HB515 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Introduced on February 21 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-03-29 - House Withdrawn, Recommitted
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Title 40 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to motor vehicles and traffic, so as require eligible applicants for limited driving permits to submit proof of completion of certain courses; to provide that completion of such courses shall be credited toward any reinstatement requirements for drivers whose licenses were suspended for certain offenses; to revise the fees relating to certain courses; to amend Code Section 17-10-3 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to punishment for misdemeanors generally, so as to allow a judge to sentence additional punishment for offenders of misdemeanor traffic violations; to provide for an effective date and applicability; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Motor vehicles; eligible applicants for limited driving permits to submit to proof of completion of certain courses; require

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2023-03-29HouseHouse Withdrawn, Recommitted
2023-03-06HouseHouse Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
2023-02-23HouseHouse Second Readers
2023-02-22HouseHouse First Readers
2023-02-21HouseHouse Hopper

Georgia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback