GA HB514 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 3 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

A BILL to be entitled an Act to repeal an Act creating the Chatham-Savannah Youth Futures Authority, approved March 10, 1988 (Ga. L.1988, p. 3743), as amended; to provide for the assets and liabilities thereof; to provide for related matters; to provide an effective date; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Chatham-Savannah Youth Futures Authority; repeal Act

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-03-22 - Senate - Senate Vote #213 (Y: 52 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-03-06 - House - House Vote #249 (Y: 157 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 10) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-07-01 Effective Date
2017-05-03 Act 116
2017-05-03HouseHouse Date Signed by Governor
2017-04-04HouseHouse Sent to Governor
2017-03-22SenateSenate Passed/Adopted
2017-03-22SenateSenate Committee Favorably Reported
2017-03-09SenateSenate Read and Referred
2017-03-06HouseHouse Passed/Adopted
2017-03-06HouseHouse Third Readers
2017-03-06HouseHouse Committee Favorably Reported
2017-03-03HouseHouse Second Readers
2017-03-01HouseHouse First Readers
2017-02-28HouseHouse Hopper

Georgia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback