GA HB508 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 30 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-30 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 30 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-30 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend an Act providing for the election of members of the Board of Education of Charlton County, approved April 17, 1975 (Ga. L. 1975, p. 3952), as amended, so as to change the provisions relating to the compensation of the members of the board; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Charlton County; Board of Education; change provisions relating to compensation of members
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-03-11 - Senate - Senate Vote #164 (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2013-03-05 - House - House Vote #177 (Y: 162 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2013-03-05 - House - House Vote #177 (Y: 162 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-30 | Effective Date | |
2013-04-30 | Act 105 | |
2013-04-30 | House | House Date Signed by Governor |
2013-04-01 | House | House Sent to Governor |
2013-03-11 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted |
2013-03-11 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2013-03-07 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2013-03-05 | House | House Passed/Adopted |
2013-03-05 | House | House Third Readers |
2013-03-05 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported |
2013-03-01 | House | House Second Readers |
2013-02-28 | House | House First Readers |
2013-02-27 | House | House Hopper |