GA HB50 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on December 21 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-01-26 - House Second Readers
Pending: House Motor Vehicles Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Code Section 40-2-86 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to special license plates promoting or supporting certain worthy agencies, funds, or nonprofit corporations with proceeds disbursed to the general fund and the agency, fund, or nonprofit corporation, so as to establish a specialty license plate supporting the fight against cancer with a share of the proceeds to be disbursed to the Georgia Center for Oncology Research and Education, Inc.; to provide for related matters; to provide for compliance with constitutional requirements; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Special license plates; Georgia Center for Oncology Research and Education, Incorporated; establish

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-01-26HouseHouse Second Readers
2021-01-14HouseHouse First Readers
2021-01-13HouseHouse Hopper
2020-12-21HouseHouse Prefiled

Georgia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback