GA HB5 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Passed on May 1 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Article 2 of Chapter 11 of Title 15 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to juvenile court administration, so as to change provisions relating to compensation of juvenile court judges; to correct a cross-reference; to provide for related matters; to provide for an effective date and applicability; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Courts; compensation of juvenile court judges; change provisions

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-03-30 - House - House Vote #401 (Y: 164 N: 8 NV: 3 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2017-03-30 - Senate - Senate Vote #355 (Y: 42 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2017-03-28 - Senate - Senate Vote #258 (Y: 51 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-01 - House - House Vote #149 (Y: 166 N: 4 NV: 5 Abs: 5) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-07-01 Effective Date
2017-05-01 Act 38
2017-05-01HouseHouse Date Signed by Governor
2017-04-05HouseHouse Sent to Governor
2017-03-30SenateSenate Agreed House Amend or Sub
2017-03-30HouseHouse Agreed Senate Amend or Sub As Amended
2017-03-28SenateSenate Passed/Adopted By Substitute
2017-03-28SenateSenate Third Read
2017-03-24SenateSenate Read Second Time
2017-03-24SenateSenate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
2017-03-03SenateSenate Read and Referred
2017-03-01HouseHouse Passed/Adopted By Substitute
2017-03-01HouseHouse Third Readers
2017-02-24HouseHouse Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
2017-02-22HouseHouse Withdrawn, Recommitted
2017-02-16HouseHouse Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
2017-01-24HouseHouse Second Readers
2017-01-23HouseHouse First Readers
2017-01-12HouseHouse Hopper
2016-11-15HouseHouse Prefiled

Georgia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.legis.ga.gov/Legislation/en-US/display/20172018/HB/5
Texthttp://www.legis.ga.gov/Legislation/20172018/162557.pdf
Texthttp://www.legis.ga.gov/Legislation/20172018/162855.pdf
Texthttp://www.legis.ga.gov/Legislation/20172018/165672.pdf
Texthttp://www.legis.ga.gov/Legislation/20172018/166563.pdf
Texthttp://www.legis.ga.gov/Legislation/20172018/167209.pdf
Texthttp://www.legis.ga.gov/Legislation/20172018/169313.pdf
Texthttp://www.legis.ga.gov/Legislation/20172018/170453.pdf
Texthttp://www.legis.ga.gov/Legislation/20172018/170274.pdf
Texthttp://www.legis.ga.gov/Legislation/20172018/170639.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.ga.gov/Legislation/en-US/vote.aspx?VoteID=14962
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.ga.gov/Legislation/en-US/vote.aspx?VoteID=15328
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.ga.gov/Legislation/en-US/vote.aspx?VoteID=15486
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.ga.gov/Legislation/en-US/vote.aspx?VoteID=15402

Bill Comments

feedback