GA HB499 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-2)
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-01-13 - Senate Recommitted
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Article 4 of Chapter 3 of Title 46 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to electric membership corporations and foreign electric cooperatives, so as to permit the use of electric easements for broadband services; to provide for a definition; to provide for legislative findings and declarations as to certain utility easements; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Public utilities and public transportation; use of electric easements for broadband services; permit

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-05 - House - House Vote #148 (Y: 166 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 6) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-01-13SenateSenate Recommitted
2020-01-13SenateSenate Taken from Table
2019-03-29SenateSenate Tabled
2019-03-28SenateSenate Read Second Time
2019-03-28SenateSenate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
2019-03-07SenateSenate Read and Referred
2019-03-05HouseHouse Passed/Adopted By Substitute
2019-03-05HouseHouse Third Readers
2019-03-01HouseHouse Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
2019-02-28HouseHouse Second Readers
2019-02-27HouseHouse First Readers
2019-02-26HouseHouse Hopper

Georgia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback