GA HB495 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on April 22 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-22 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on April 22 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-22 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Article 2 of Chapter 16 of Title 50 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to the State Properties Code, so as to modify provisions related to conveyances of state property and consideration of conveyances by the General Assembly; to facilitate and increase reliability of state property conveyances; to provide for consideration of conveyances by committees of the General Assembly outside of the regular legislative session; to modify provisions related to public bidding of state property; to authorize the commission to manage the utilization of administrative space by the Georgia Department of Labor; to provide for related matters; to provide an effective date; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
State Properties Code; conveyance of state property and consideration of conveyances by General Assembly; modify provisions
Sponsors
Rep. Calvin Hill [R] | Rep. Jay Neal [R] | Rep. Gerald Greene [R] | Sen. Burt Jones [R] |
Roll Calls
2014-03-10 - Senate - Senate Vote #593 (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-02-24 - House - House Vote #572 (Y: 163 N: 2 NV: 7 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2014-02-24 - House - House Vote #572 (Y: 163 N: 2 NV: 7 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-22 | Effective Date | |
2014-04-22 | Act 580 | |
2014-04-22 | House | House Date Signed by Governor |
2014-03-24 | House | House Sent to Governor |
2014-03-10 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted |
2014-03-10 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2014-03-07 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2014-03-06 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2014-02-25 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2014-02-24 | House | House Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2014-02-24 | House | House Third Readers |
2014-02-19 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2013-03-28 | House | House Withdrawn, Recommitted |
2013-02-28 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2013-02-28 | House | House Second Readers |
2013-02-27 | House | House First Readers |
2013-02-26 | House | House Hopper |