GA HB493 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-2)
Status: Engrossed on February 26 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-03-23 - Senate Read Second Time
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Code Section 50-14-1 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to meetings to be open to public, limitation on action to contest agency action, recording, notice of time and place, access to minutes, and telecommunications conferences, so as to require that public commentary be included in agency minutes and online videos; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Open and public meetings; agency minutes and online videos; require public commentary be included

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-02-26 - House - House Vote #582 (Y: 170 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 9) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-23SenateSenate Read Second Time
2018-03-23SenateSenate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
2018-02-28SenateSenate Read and Referred
2018-02-26HouseHouse Passed/Adopted By Substitute
2018-02-26HouseHouse Third Readers
2018-02-01HouseHouse Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
2017-03-30HouseHouse Withdrawn, Recommitted
2017-03-01HouseHouse Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
2017-02-28HouseHouse Second Readers
2017-02-27HouseHouse First Readers
2017-02-24HouseHouse Hopper

Georgia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback