GA HB493 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-2)
Status: Engrossed on February 26 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-23 - Senate Read Second Time
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 26 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-23 - Senate Read Second Time
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Code Section 50-14-1 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to meetings to be open to public, limitation on action to contest agency action, recording, notice of time and place, access to minutes, and telecommunications conferences, so as to require that public commentary be included in agency minutes and online videos; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Open and public meetings; agency minutes and online videos; require public commentary be included
Sponsors
Rep. Valencia Stovall [D] | Rep. Scot Turner [R] | Rep. Wesley Cantrell [R] | Sen. Ed Setzler [R] |
Rep. Ed Rynders [R] | Rep. Sandra Scott [D] | Sen. Marty Harbin [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-02-26 - House - House Vote #582 (Y: 170 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 9) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-23 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2018-03-23 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2018-02-28 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2018-02-26 | House | House Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2018-02-26 | House | House Third Readers |
2018-02-01 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2017-03-30 | House | House Withdrawn, Recommitted |
2017-03-01 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2017-02-28 | House | House Second Readers |
2017-02-27 | House | House First Readers |
2017-02-24 | House | House Hopper |