GA HB492 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Passed on May 6 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Passed on May 6 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Chapter 11 of Title 16 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to offenses against public order and safety, so as to revise provisions regarding carrying in unauthorized locations; to amend Article 4 of Chapter 18 of Title 50, relating to the inspection of public records, so as to provide for the disclosure of records relating to licensing and possession of firearms between the judges of the probate court; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Crimes and offenses; carrying in unauthorized locations; revise provisions
Sponsors
Rep. Rick Jasperse [R] | Rep. Alan Powell [R] | Rep. John Meadows [R] | Rep. Dustin Hightower [R] |
Rep. Mandi Ballinger [R] | Rep. Jay Roberts [R] | Sen. Frank Ginn [R] |
Roll Calls
2015-03-31 - House - House Vote #373 (Y: 150 N: 15 NV: 8 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2015-03-27 - Senate - Senate Vote #256 (Y: 16 N: 33 NV: 3 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
2015-03-27 - Senate - Senate Vote #257 (Y: 18 N: 34 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
2015-03-27 - Senate - Senate Vote #258 (Y: 16 N: 36 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
2015-03-27 - Senate - Senate Vote #259 (Y: 45 N: 6 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2015-03-09 - House - House Vote #145 (Y: 153 N: 3 NV: 17 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2015-03-27 - Senate - Senate Vote #256 (Y: 16 N: 33 NV: 3 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
2015-03-27 - Senate - Senate Vote #257 (Y: 18 N: 34 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
2015-03-27 - Senate - Senate Vote #258 (Y: 16 N: 36 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
2015-03-27 - Senate - Senate Vote #259 (Y: 45 N: 6 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2015-03-09 - House - House Vote #145 (Y: 153 N: 3 NV: 17 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-07-01 | Effective Date | |
2015-05-06 | Act 100 | |
2015-05-06 | House | House Date Signed by Governor |
2015-04-07 | House | House Sent to Governor |
2015-03-31 | House | House Agreed Senate Amend or Sub |
2015-03-27 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2015-03-27 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2015-03-26 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2015-03-26 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2015-03-11 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2015-03-09 | House | House Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2015-03-09 | House | House Third Readers |
2015-03-04 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2015-03-02 | House | House Second Readers |
2015-02-26 | House | House First Readers |
2015-02-25 | House | House Hopper |