GA HB490 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 3 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-03 - Effective Date 2021-05-03
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 3 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-03 - Effective Date 2021-05-03
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend an Act creating the office of commissioner of Catoosa County, approved February 12, 1943 (Ga. L. 1943, p. 858), as amended, particularly by an Act approved March 28, 1986 (Ga. L. 1986, p. 5538) and an Act approved March 19, 1987 (Ga. L. 1987, p. 4290) so as to remove certain bidding requirements on certain purchases made by the county; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Catoosa County; certain purchases made; remove certain bidding requirements
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-01 - Senate - Local Consent Calendar: Senate Vote #94 (Y: 49 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-02-23 - House - Local Calendar: House Vote #73 (Y: 134 N: 10 NV: 26 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2021-02-23 - House - Local Calendar: House Vote #73 (Y: 134 N: 10 NV: 26 Abs: 9) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-03 | Effective Date 2021-05-03 | |
2021-05-03 | Act 59 | |
2021-05-03 | House | House Date Signed by Governor |
2021-04-05 | House | House Sent to Governor |
2021-03-01 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted |
2021-03-01 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2021-02-24 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2021-02-23 | House | House Passed/Adopted |
2021-02-23 | House | House Third Readers |
2021-02-23 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported |
2021-02-22 | House | House Second Readers |
2021-02-18 | House | House First Readers |
2021-02-17 | House | House Hopper |