GA HB490 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Passed on April 15 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-07-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Passed on April 15 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-07-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Part 6 of Article 17 of Chapter 2 of Title 20 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to health insurance plans for teachers and other school personnel, so as to expand board authorization to contract with local employers to librarians and other personnel employed by regional and county libraries; to provide for definitions; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; for other purposes.
Title
Teacher health insurance plans; contract with local employers to librarians and other personnel employed by regional and county libraries; expand board authorization
Sponsors
Rep. Timothy Barr [R] | Rep. David Casas [R] | Rep. Carlton Rogers [R] | Rep. Matthew Ramsey [R] |
Rep. Howard Maxwell [R] | Rep. Jay Neal [R] | Sen. Bill Cowsert [R] |
Roll Calls
2014-03-18 - Senate - Senate Vote #665 (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-02-24 - House - House Vote #570 (Y: 166 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2014-02-24 - House - House Vote #570 (Y: 166 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-07-01 | Effective Date | |
2014-04-15 | Act 498 | |
2014-04-15 | House | House Date Signed by Governor |
2014-03-26 | House | House Sent to Governor |
2014-03-18 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted |
2014-03-18 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2014-03-18 | Senate | Senate Taken from Table |
2014-03-18 | Senate | Senate Tabled |
2014-03-13 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2014-03-13 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2014-02-25 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2014-02-24 | House | House Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2014-02-24 | House | House Third Readers |
2014-02-18 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2013-03-07 | House | House Withdrawn, Recommitted |
2013-03-01 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported |
2013-02-28 | House | House Second Readers |
2013-02-27 | House | House First Readers |
2013-02-26 | House | House Hopper |