GA HB489 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Passed on May 8 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Passed on May 8 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Title 36 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to local government, so as to provide that the Georgia Procurement Registry shall be used in addition to the official legal organ and other media outlets for advertisement of certain bid opportunities for goods and services and public works construction contracts by a county, municipal corporation, or local board of education; to provide that advertisement via the Georgia Procurement Registry shall be at no cost to local government entities; to require advertisement of certain bid opportunities by local government entities via the Georgia Procurement Registry; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Local government; use Georgia Procurement Registry in addition to official legal organ to advertise certain bid opportunities; provide
Sponsors
Rep. Tom McCall [R] | Rep. Alan Powell [R] | Rep. Mike Glanton [D] | Rep. Patty Stinson [D] |
Rep. Mark Newton [R] | Sen. Matt Brass [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-03-29 - House - House Vote #813 (Y: 167 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-03-23 - Senate - Senate Vote #681 (Y: 46 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2018-02-28 - House - House Vote #599 (Y: 172 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-03-23 - Senate - Senate Vote #681 (Y: 46 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2018-02-28 - House - House Vote #599 (Y: 172 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-07-01 | Effective Date | |
2018-05-08 | Act 470 | |
2018-05-08 | House | House Date Signed by Governor |
2018-04-05 | House | House Sent to Governor |
2018-03-29 | House | House Agreed Senate Amend or Sub |
2018-03-23 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2018-03-23 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2018-03-15 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2018-03-14 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2018-02-28 | House | House Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2018-02-28 | House | House Third Readers |
2018-02-15 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2017-02-27 | House | House Second Readers |
2017-02-24 | House | House First Readers |
2017-02-23 | House | House Hopper |