GA HB488 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Passed on May 4 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-04 - Effective Date 2021-05-04
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Passed on May 4 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-04 - Effective Date 2021-05-04
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Title 15 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to courts, so as to provide for an increase in the minimum compensation for chief magistrates; to provide for the calculation of future increases in the minimum compensation for chief magistrates; to provide for an increase in the minimum compensation for other magistrates; to provide for an increase in the minimum compensation for clerks of magistrate courts; to provide for related matters; to provide for an effective date; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Courts; increase minimum compensation for chief magistrates and others; provide
Sponsors
Rep. Mitchell Scoggins [R] | Rep. Trey Kelley [R] | Rep. Rob Leverett [R] | Rep. Eddie Lumsden [R] |
Rep. Matthew Gambill [R] | Rep. Tyler Smith [R] | Sen. Chuck Payne [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-03-31 - Senate - Agree To House Amendment To Senate Amendment: Senate Vote #423 (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2021-03-31 - House - Agree Sen Am As Am: House Vote #361 (Y: 163 N: 2 NV: 11 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-03-29 - Senate - Passage As Amended: Senate Vote #318 (Y: 51 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-03-29 - Senate - Motion To Remove From The Table: Senate Vote #317 (Y: 46 N: 5 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-02-26 - House - Passage: House Vote #113 (Y: 154 N: 7 NV: 7 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2021-03-31 - House - Agree Sen Am As Am: House Vote #361 (Y: 163 N: 2 NV: 11 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-03-29 - Senate - Passage As Amended: Senate Vote #318 (Y: 51 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-03-29 - Senate - Motion To Remove From The Table: Senate Vote #317 (Y: 46 N: 5 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-02-26 - House - Passage: House Vote #113 (Y: 154 N: 7 NV: 7 Abs: 11) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-04 | Effective Date 2021-05-04 | |
2021-05-04 | Act 198 | |
2021-05-04 | House | House Date Signed by Governor |
2021-04-09 | House | House Sent to Governor |
2021-03-31 | Senate | Senate Agreed House Amend or Sub |
2021-03-31 | House | House Agreed Senate Amend or Sub As Amended |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted As Amended |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Senate Taken from Table |
2021-03-18 | Senate | Senate Tabled |
2021-03-17 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2021-03-16 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2021-03-01 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2021-02-26 | House | House Passed/Adopted |
2021-02-26 | House | House Third Readers |
2021-02-24 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported |
2021-02-22 | House | House Second Readers |
2021-02-18 | House | House First Readers |
2021-02-17 | House | House Hopper |