GA HB486 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on May 8 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-08 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Code Section 43-26-12 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to exceptions to operation of the Georgia Registered Professional Nurse Practice Act and burden of proof, so as to provide for training of proxy caregivers; to provide for selection of curricula by the Department of Behavioral Health and Developmental Disabilities; to provide for select providers to train proxy caregivers in accordance with selected curriculum; to provide for professional delegation exceptions; to revise good faith efforts; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Georgia Registered Professional Nurse Practice Act; training of proxy caregivers; provisions

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-03-30 - Senate - Senate Vote #364 (Y: 46 N: 1 NV: 5 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-03-28 - Senate - Senate Vote #297 (Y: 50 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-01 - House - House Vote #167 (Y: 166 N: 1 NV: 5 Abs: 8) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-08 Effective Date
2017-05-08 Act 218
2017-05-08HouseHouse Date Signed by Governor
2017-04-05HouseHouse Sent to Governor
2017-03-30SenateSenate Passed/Adopted
2017-03-30SenateSenate Taken from Table
2017-03-28SenateSenate Tabled
2017-03-20SenateSenate Read Second Time
2017-03-20SenateSenate Committee Favorably Reported
2017-03-03SenateSenate Read and Referred
2017-03-01HouseHouse Passed/Adopted By Substitute
2017-03-01HouseHouse Third Readers
2017-02-27HouseHouse Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
2017-02-24HouseHouse Second Readers
2017-02-23HouseHouse First Readers
2017-02-23HouseHouse Hopper

Georgia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback