GA HB480 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 1 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

A BILL to be entitled an Act to create the Chatham County Urban Development Authority; to provide a short title; to provide for findings and determinations; to define certain terms; to provide for a board of trustees, appointment of members, and meetings; to provide for powers and duties; to authorize the issuance of revenue bonds of the authority and to authorize the collection for the payment of such revenue bonds; to make the revenue bonds of the authority exempt from taxation; to fix and provide the venue and jurisdiction of actions relating to the authority; to provide for the validation of bonds; to provide for related matters; to provide for an effective date; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Chatham County Urban Development Authority Act; enact

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-03-28 - Senate - Senate Vote #248 (Y: 49 N: 2 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-01 - House - House Vote #143 (Y: 164 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 6) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-01 Effective Date
2017-05-01 Act 70
2017-05-01HouseHouse Date Signed by Governor
2017-04-04HouseHouse Sent to Governor
2017-03-28SenateSenate Passed/Adopted
2017-03-28SenateSenate Committee Favorably Reported
2017-03-03SenateSenate Read and Referred
2017-03-01HouseHouse Passed/Adopted
2017-03-01HouseHouse Third Readers
2017-03-01HouseHouse Committee Favorably Reported
2017-02-27HouseHouse Second Readers
2017-02-24HouseHouse First Readers
2017-02-23HouseHouse Hopper

Georgia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback